NY A10331 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8116b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8116b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the town of Tonawanda, county of Erie, to alienate certain parcels of land used as parklands for the placement and operation of a cellular tower facility.
Title
Relates to authorizing the town of Tonawanda, county of Erie, to alienate certain parcels of land used as parklands for the placement and operation of a cellular tower facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8116b |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.413 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.413 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | print number 10331b |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | print number 10331a |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08116 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.496