NY S08116 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing the town of Tonawanda, county of Erie, to alienate certain parcels of land used as parklands for the placement and operation of a cellular tower facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing the town of Tonawanda, county of Erie, to alienate certain parcels of land used as parklands for the placement and operation of a cellular tower facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.413
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10331b
2018-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2018-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1729
2018-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 8116B
2018-06-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-04-26SenatePRINT NUMBER 8116A
2018-04-26SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-03-29SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10331 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8116b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08116&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08116&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08116
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08116&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08116A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08116&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08116B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8116#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8116#SC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08116&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback