NY A10215 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits third-party restaurant reservation services from arranging unauthorized restaurant reservations with food service establishments; establishes fines for violations of such prohibition.
Title
Prohibits third-party restaurant reservation services from arranging unauthorized restaurant reservations with food service establishments; establishes fines for violations of such prohibition.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Bores [D] | Asm. Eddie Gibbs [D] | Asm. Emily Gallagher [D] | Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D] |
Asm. Grace Lee [D] | Asm. Anil Beephan [R] | Asm. Nily Rozic [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1596 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9365A |
2024-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.292 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.292 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | print number 10215a |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S09365 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10215A