NY A10204 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts students in gun safety and proficiency courses from certain provisions of law.
Title
Exempts students in gun safety and proficiency courses from certain provisions of law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.330 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1196 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7436 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.679 |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07436 (Same As) 2012-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10204