NY A10200 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - substituted by s7307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the transfer of certain funds to the Brockport fire district from the village of Brockport and the Sweden Fire Protection District and the Clarkson Fire Protection District upon the dissolution of such districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the transfer of certain funds to the Brockport fire district from the village of Brockport and the Sweden Fire Protection District and the Clarkson Fire Protection District upon the dissolution of such districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s7307
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.460
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-18Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-05-10Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S07307 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.428

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback