NY S07307 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the transfer of certain funds to the Brockport fire district from the village of Brockport and the Sweden Fire Protection District and the Clarkson Fire Protection District upon the dissolution of such districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the transfer of certain funds to the Brockport fire district from the village of Brockport and the Sweden Fire Protection District and the Clarkson Fire Protection District upon the dissolution of such districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.428
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2012-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2012-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.460
2012-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10200
2012-06-13Assemblyreferred to local governments
2012-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-13SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2012-06-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-06-11Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-06-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1130
2012-05-02SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10200 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s7307

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback