NY A10195 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the beginning farmer advisory board on agriculture.
Title
Relates to the beginning farmer advisory board on agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.271 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.271 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |