NY A10130 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to merging town justice courts; excepts the towns of Erin and Chemung from the requirement that towns form a contiguous geographic area in order to merge their town courts.
Title
Relates to merging town justice courts; excepts the towns of Erin and Chemung from the requirement that towns form a contiguous geographic area in order to merge their town courts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s7328 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.365 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.365 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07328 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.205