NY A10102 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Muslims on Long Island, Inc. to retroactively apply for real property tax exemptions for certain properties in Bethpage, town of Oyster Bay, county of Nassau.
Title
Authorizes Muslims on Long Island, Inc. to retroactively apply for real property tax exemptions for certain properties in Bethpage, town of Oyster Bay, county of Nassau.
Sponsors
Asm. James Conte [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | signed chap.164 |
2012-07-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.832 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6999B |
2012-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.491 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.491 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | print number 10102b |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2012-05-18 | Assembly | print number 10102a |
2012-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2012-05-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06999 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10102B