NY S06999 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10102B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10102B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Muslims on Long Island, Inc. to retroactively apply for real property tax exemptions for certain properties in Bethpage, Town of Oyster Bay, county of Nassau.
Title
Authorizes Muslims on Long Island, Inc. to retroactively apply for real property tax exemptions for certain properties in Bethpage, Town of Oyster Bay, county of Nassau.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10102B |
2012-06-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6999B |
2012-06-18 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-15 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-06-15 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2012-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-21 | Senate | AMENDED 6999A |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.832 |
2012-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10102 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - signed chap.164