NY A10092 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sealing records for certain proceedings that terminate in favor of the accused where the charges relate to the possession of marihuana.
Title
Relates to sealing records for certain proceedings that terminate in favor of the accused where the charges relate to the possession of marihuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.195 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.195 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08047 (Same As) 2016-06-07 - REFERRED TO RULES