NY A10081 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - substituted by s9106a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - substituted by s9106a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Saint James Evangelical Lutheran Church of Saint James Long Island NY to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes the Saint James Evangelical Lutheran Church of Saint James Long Island NY to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s9106a |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.465 |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2024-05-10 | Assembly | print number 10081a |
2024-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2024-05-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S09106 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - returned to senate