NY A10073 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.217
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.217
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including Journeys End Lake as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Relates to including Journeys End Lake as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Senate | signed chap.217 |
2020-09-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.918 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8542 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.114 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.114 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | print number 10073a |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2020-03-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08542 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - signed chap.217