NY S08542 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including Journeys End Lake as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Relates to including Journeys End Lake as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Senate | signed chap.217 |
2020-09-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.918 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8542 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.114 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | rules report cal.114 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Senate | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-06-04 | Senate | print number 10073a |
2020-06-04 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2020-03-06 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10073A |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.918 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10073 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - signed chap.217