NY A10067 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-17 - substituted by s6966
Status: Introduced on March 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-17 - substituted by s6966
Summary
Provides that no position in the state which has been previously classified in the competitive class shall be reclassified into the non-competitive or exempt class.
Title
Provides that no position in the state which has been previously classified in the competitive class shall be reclassified into the non-competitive or exempt class.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | substituted by s6966 | |
2010-05-20 | advanced to third reading cal.911 | |
2010-05-18 | reported | |
2010-03-03 | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S6966 (Same As) 2010-07-21 - VETOED MEMO.6712
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10067&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |