NY S06966 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - VETOED MEMO.6712
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - VETOED MEMO.6712
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no position in the state which has been previously classified in the competitive class shall be reclassified into the non-competitive or exempt class.
Title
Provides that no position in the state which has been previously classified in the competitive class shall be reclassified into the non-competitive or exempt class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | VETOED MEMO.6712 | |
2010-07-09 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-06-17 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-17 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-17 | ordered to third reading cal.911 | |
2010-06-17 | substituted for a10067 | |
2010-06-02 | referred to governmental employees | |
2010-06-02 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-02 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-05-25 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-05-24 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-05-18 | 1ST REPORT CAL.592 | |
2010-03-01 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10067 (Same As) 2010-06-17 - substituted by s6966