NY A10048 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-9)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s8104a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s8104a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes within the class D felony of assault in the second degree, the intentional causing of physical injury to a station cleaner or terminal cleaner employed by a mass transit company, while such cleaner is engaged in such employment.
Title
Includes within the class D felony of assault in the second degree, the intentional causing of physical injury to a station cleaner or terminal cleaner employed by a mass transit company, while such cleaner is engaged in such employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s8104a |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.524 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | print number 10048b |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | print number 10048a |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-05-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |