NY A10037 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9269a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9269a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Ballston Spa to transfer ownership of the Woods Hollow Nature Preserve to the town of Milton; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes the village of Ballston Spa to transfer ownership of the Woods Hollow Nature Preserve to the town of Milton; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Mary Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s9269a |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.646 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2024-05-31 | Assembly | print number 10037a |
2024-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S09269 (Same As) 2024-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.408