NY A10002 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.323
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the organization of university faculty practice corporations and physical therapy programs.
Title
Relates to the organization of university faculty practice corporations and physical therapy programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.323 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.741 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6980 |
2012-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.61 |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.61 |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-05-01 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06980 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10002