NY A09991 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes restrictions on consumer and employment contracts.
Title
Establishes restrictions on consumer and employment contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.718 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |