NY A09808 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-07 - print number 9808a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-07 - print number 9808a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide start-up and expansion funding for not-for-pro- fit sponsors of small-scale food processing facilities.
Title
Establishes a kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facility program within the urban development corporation to provide grant funding to local development corporations, municipalities, educational institutions and not-for-profit entities for the development or expansion of kitchen incubator/shared-use kitchen facilities which make available services such as food production, technical assistance, business management and marketing, distribution, storage and retailing assistance, particularly in economically distressed areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | print number 9808a | |
2010-06-07 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-05-11 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-04-07 | reference changed to small business | |
2010-01-29 | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S07729 (Same As) 2010-06-23 - referred to ways and means