NY A09789 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - signed chap.190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - signed chap.190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions of law relating to tuition waivers for police officer students of the city university of New York.
Title
Extends certain provisions of law relating to tuition waivers for police officer students of the city university of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | signed chap.190 | |
2010-07-08 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-24 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-24 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-24 | 3RD READING CAL.1193 | |
2010-06-24 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6706 | |
2010-06-23 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-23 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-23 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-23 | ordered to third reading rules cal.296 | |
2010-06-23 | rules report cal.296 | |
2010-06-23 | reported | |
2010-06-08 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-04 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-28 | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S6706 (Same As) -