NY A09771 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - substituted by s3959
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - substituted by s3959
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Newburgh to establish an administrative tribunal for the adjudication of parking infractions; further authorizes the city of Newburgh to provide for the appointment of hearing examiners.
Title
Authorizes the city of Newburgh to establish an administrative tribunal for the adjudication of parking infractions; further authorizes the city of Newburgh to provide for the appointment of hearing examiners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s3959 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.358 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.358 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-04-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03959 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.408
A07299 (Same As) 2011-06-07 - held for consideration in transportation
A07299 (Same As) 2011-06-07 - held for consideration in transportation