NY A09590 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the waiver of the residency requirement for the city attorney in the city of Mechanicville, Saratoga county.
Title
Expands the waiver of the residency requirement for the city attorney in the city of Mechanicville, Saratoga county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.478 |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07006 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS