NY A09584 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - signed chap.246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - signed chap.246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the sale of food or beverages at retail for consumption at certain premises located in the village of North Syracuse, county of Onondaga.
Title
Authorizes the sale of food or beverages at retail for consumption at certain premises located in the village of North Syracuse, county of Onondaga.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-28 | Assembly | signed chap.246 |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-05-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1437 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9003 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-03-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.388 |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | reported |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S09003 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9584