NY A09531 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-36)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - substituted by s7160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - substituted by s7160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides up to three years of service credit to members of public retirement systems of the state for military service rendered during times of peace; removes requirement that such military service occur during specified periods of hostilities; requires such members have at least five years of credited service, not including military service; appropriates $24,800,000 therefor.
Title
Provides up to three years of service credit to members of public retirement systems of the state for military service rendered during times of peace; removes requirement that such military service occur during specified periods of hostilities; requires such members have at least five years of credited service, not including military service; appropriates $24,800,000 therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Assembly | substituted by s7160 |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.618 |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |