NY A09406 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - signed chap.389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - signed chap.389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires information concerning services for human trafficking victims in airports; provides that such provisions shall not apply to any airport operated by a bi-state authority; defines terms.
Title
Requires information concerning services for human trafficking victims in airports; provides that such provisions shall not apply to any airport operated by a bi-state authority; defines terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | Assembly | signed chap.389 |
2022-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1674 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8710 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.494 |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | reported |
2022-03-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08710 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9406