NY A09331 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires nonpublic schools provide and maintain on-site automatic external defibrillator (AED) equipment on school grounds and assure that AED equipment is available for off-site curricular events, extracurricular events or school-sponsored athletic events.
Title
Requires nonpublic schools provide and maintain on-site automatic external defibrillator (AED) equipment on school grounds and assure that AED equipment is available for off-site curricular events, extracurricular events or school-sponsored athletic events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-17 | Assembly | print number 9331b |
2024-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | print number 9331a |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08409 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - referred to ways and means