NY A09282 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - signed chap.605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - signed chap.605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to industrial hemp development by including representatives from the New York state hemp workgroup and representatives from industries that currently use or may use industrial hemp in their products.
Title
Relates to industrial hemp development by including representatives from the New York state hemp workgroup and representatives from industries that currently use or may use industrial hemp in their products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Assembly | signed chap.605 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.983 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8496 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.451 |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | reported |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S08496 (Same As) 2022-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9282