MA S1188 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require one fair wage. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Requiring one fair wage
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | Senate | No further action taken |
2024-08-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1155 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2633
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1188 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1188.pdf |