NY S08496 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9282
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9282
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to industrial hemp development by including representatives from the New York state hemp workgroup and representatives from industries that currently use or may use industrial hemp in their products.
Title
Relates to industrial hemp development by including representatives from the New York state hemp workgroup and representatives from industries that currently use or may use industrial hemp in their products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9282 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.983 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A09282 (Same As) 2022-11-21 - signed chap.605