DC B25-0106 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-23 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 06, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-23 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 06, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-106 would expand the District’s Electric Vehicle Charging Station Pilot Program to allow DDOT to use federal infrastructure dollars to deploy EV charging stations in areas lacking EV infrastructure beginning in 2024. It would also require DDOT to create an Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Deployment and Management Plan in 2024 to aid in assessing the electric grid’s readiness and resiliency for EV charging. It establishes when EV charging infrastructure is required to be incentivized, installed or upgraded by property owners and renters.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement for more information.
Title
Comprehensive Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Access, Readiness, and Sustainability Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-10-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-10-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-10-01 - Council - Oral Amendment (Allen) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-10-01 - Council - Allen (ANS) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-10-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-10-01 - Council - Oral Amendment (Allen) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-10-01 - Council - Allen (ANS) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-23 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Mar 06, 2025 |
2024-11-22 | Council | Act A25-0625 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 014111 |
2024-11-14 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A25-0625 |
2024-11-13 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-10-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 13, 2024 |
2024-10-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-10-01 | Council | First Reading |
2024-10-01 | Council | Oral Amendment (Allen) |
2024-10-01 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) |
2024-09-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-07-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B25-0106 |
2024-07-10 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-01-10 | Council | Notice of Mark-up Cancellation filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-01-03 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2023-07-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-07-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0106 Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2023-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |