NY A09130 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7161
Hearing: Feb 8 @ 7:00 pm Assembly Aging Committee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7161
Hearing: Feb 8 @ 7:00 pm Assembly Aging Committee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to rules and regulations pertaining to the operation of social adult day care programs.
Title
Relates to rules and regulations pertaining to the operation of social adult day care programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s7161 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.344 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.344 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-29 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S07161 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.288