NY A09070 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - SIGNED CHAP.340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - SIGNED CHAP.340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to removing certain provisions relating to pre-need funeral services.
Title
Relates to removing certain provisions relating to pre-need funeral services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.340 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.186 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | substituted for a9070 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.438 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted by s7364 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.186 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07364 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - SIGNED CHAP.340