NY A09021 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing that a deputy sheriff of the county of Chenango need not be a resident of such county.
Title
Relates to providing that a deputy sheriff of the county of Chenango need not be a resident of such county.
Sponsors
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Joseph Errigo [R] | Asm. Peter Lawrence [R] |
Asm. Gary Finch [R] | Asm. William Magee [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7389 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.321 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07389 (Same As) 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.340