NY A08983 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-05 - ordered to third reading rules cal.453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-05 - ordered to third reading rules cal.453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes implants, replacement dental prosthetic appliances, crowns and root canals as medically necessary dental care and services for coverage under the Medicaid program if a qualified dentist authorizes the procedures.
Title
Includes implants, replacement dental prosthetic appliances, crowns and root canals as medically necessary dental care and services for coverage under the Medicaid program if a qualified dentist authorizes the procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.453 |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.453 |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07667 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - referred to ways and means