NY S07667 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes implants, replacement dental prosthetic appliances, crowns and root canals as medically necessary dental care and services for coverage under the Medicaid program if a qualified dentist authorizes the procedures.
Title
Includes implants, replacement dental prosthetic appliances, crowns and root canals as medically necessary dental care and services for coverage under the Medicaid program if a qualified dentist authorizes the procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.994 |
2024-01-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7667A |
2024-01-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-09-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08983 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - ordered to third reading rules cal.453