NY A08835 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force on adults with developmental disabilities to study, evaluate and develop recommendations concerning vocational, recreational and social needs of such adults.
Title
Establishes a task force on adults with developmental disabilities to study, evaluate and develop recommendations concerning vocational, recreational and social needs of such adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | tabled |
2014-11-21 | Senate | vetoed memo.499 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1082 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6659A |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.832 |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-21 | Assembly | print number 8835a |
2014-03-21 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S06659 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8835A