NY A08743 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the imposition and collection of a fare, toll, rental, rate, charge or other fee on the Cross Bay Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Title
Prohibits the imposition and collection of a fare, toll, rental, rate, charge or other fee on the Cross Bay Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.169 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.169 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | print number 8743a |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-10-25 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06909 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6909A