NY S06909 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6909A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6909A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the imposition and collection of a fare, toll, rental, rate, charge or other fee on the Cross Bay Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Title
Prohibits the imposition and collection of a fare, toll, rental, rate, charge or other fee on the Cross Bay Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6909A |
2018-06-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2017-10-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08743 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES