NY A08587 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-29 - print number 8587b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-29 - print number 8587b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To design more complete streets that enable safe access for all users: bicyclists, public transportation vehicles and passengers, motorists, and pedestrians of all ages arid abilities.
Title
Enables safe access to public roads for all users by requiring that all transportation improvements shall improve safety, access, and mobility for all travelers regardless of age or ability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | print number 8587b | |
2010-06-29 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-06-15 | print number 8587a | |
2010-06-15 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-06-15 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to transportation | |
2009-05-29 | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S5711 (Same As) 2010-06-17 - referred to transportation