NY A08548 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.344
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.344
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a certain portion of state route two hundred seventy-seven in the town of West Seneca, county of Erie, to be the "West Seneca Veterans Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a certain portion of state route two hundred seventy-seven in the town of West Seneca, county of Erie, to be the "West Seneca Veterans Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Senate | signed chap.344 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.211 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6058A |
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.59 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.59 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | print number 8548a |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-10-30 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06058 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8548A