NY A08474 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-07 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-07 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides grants for accredited level two geriatric emergency departments; establishes an age-friendly health system technical assistance center to provide assistance in relation to age-friendly health systems; relates to hospital performance data.
Title
Provides grants for accredited level two geriatric emergency departments; establishes an age-friendly health system technical assistance center to provide assistance in relation to age-friendly health systems; relates to hospital performance data.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-03-15 | Assembly | print number 8474c |
2024-03-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | print number 8474b |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | print number 8474a |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-12-29 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08651 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - PRINT NUMBER 8651A