NY A08458 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-09 - signed chap.489
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-09 - signed chap.489
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of labor to develop a public awareness campaign promoting the New York state job bank.
Title
Authorizes the department of labor to develop a public awareness campaign promoting the New York state job bank.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-09 | Assembly | signed chap.489 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1083 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6803A |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.137 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.137 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | print number 8458a |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-11-17 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06803 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8458A