NY A08410 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-15)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-04 - print number 8410a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-04 - print number 8410a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts Bill of Adoptee Rights clarifying language and procedures for obtaining birth certificates and medical histories of adoptees; permits an adopted adult to access certain records when they reach the age of 18; creates a contact preference to be filed by birth parents; directs a task force be appointed to assess the progress and administration of such initiatives.
Title
Enacts Bill of Adoptee Rights clarifying language and procedures for obtaining birth certificates and medical histories of adoptees; permits an adopted adult to access certain records when they reach the age of 18; creates a contact preference to be filed by birth parents; directs a task force be appointed to assess the progress and administration of such initiatives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | print number 8410a | |
2010-06-04 | amend and recommit to codes | |
2010-05-11 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-01-06 | referred to health | |
2009-06-09 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-05-19 | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S5269 (Same As) 2010-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 5269A