NY A08373 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for adult changing tables to be placed within an enclosed restroom facility or other similar private facility that is for use by persons with disabilities who need help with diapering at commercial places of public amusement and state-owned buildings open to the public.
Title
Provides for adult changing tables to be placed within an enclosed restroom facility or other similar private facility that is for use by persons with disabilities who need help with diapering at commercial places of public amusement and state-owned buildings open to the public.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | print number 8373c |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | print number 8373b |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | print number 8373a |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-12-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07697 (Same As) 2024-05-06 - PRINT NUMBER 7697B