NY A08370 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - print number 8370a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - print number 8370a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that elections for municipal office in the city of New York shall use an "instant run-off" or "ranked choice" voting system.
Title
Requires that elections for municipal office in the city of New York shall use an "instant run-off" or "ranked choice" voting system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Assembly | print number 8370a |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to election law |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01447 (Same As) 2020-01-16 - PRINT NUMBER 1447A