NY S01447 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - PRINT NUMBER 1447A
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that elections for municipal office in the city of New York shall use an "instant run-off" or "ranked choice" voting system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that elections for municipal office in the city of New York shall use an "instant run-off" or "ranked choice" voting system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 1447A
2020-01-16SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2019-01-14SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A08370 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - print number 8370a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback