NY A08340 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - substituted by s5431c
Status: Introduced on May 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - substituted by s5431c
Summary
Requires massage therapists to complete thirty-six hours of continuing education each registration period.
Title
Requires massage therapists to complete thirty-six hours of continuing education each registration period.
Sponsors
Asm. William Boyland [D] | Asm. Nelson Castro [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Ginny Fields [D] |
Asm. David Koon [D] | Asm. John McEneny [D] | Asm. Joseph Morelle [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | substituted by s5431c | |
2010-06-15 | ordered to third reading rules cal.132 | |
2010-06-15 | rules report cal.132 | |
2010-06-15 | reported | |
2010-06-15 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-03 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-05-27 | print number 8340c | |
2010-05-27 | amend and recommit to higher education | |
2010-05-17 | print number 8340b | |
2010-05-17 | amend and recommit to higher education | |
2010-03-02 | print number 8340a | |
2010-03-02 | amend and recommit to higher education | |
2010-01-06 | referred to higher education | |
2009-05-15 | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S5431-A (Same As) 2010-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.463
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08340&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |