NY A08294 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-14)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the veterans' services law and the department of veterans' services; replaces all instances of the term "division of veterans' services" with the term "department of veterans' services".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the veterans' services law and the department of veterans' services; replaces all instances of the term "division of veterans' services" with the term "department of veterans' services".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-25Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs
2021-12-13Assemblyprint number 8294a
2021-12-13Assemblyamend and recommit to veterans' affairs
2021-10-15Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

Same As/Similar To

S07526 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback